This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 07:16:25 (UTC).

MEHL, LINDA J VS MEHL, ROBERT C

Case Summary

On 01/18/2017 MEHL, LINDA J filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MEHL, ROBERT C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4302

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEHL LINDA J

Respondent

MEHL ROBERT C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2017
  • Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mehl, Linda - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-14 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mehl, Linda - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-14 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mehl, Linda - Filed and Entered on 2017-04-14 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mehl, Linda ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mehl, Linda ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mehl, Linda ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Mehl, Robert ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 04-13-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mehl, Linda ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mehl, Linda ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 04-13-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mehl, Linda ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mehl, Linda ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less