This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2022 at 04:48:38 (UTC).

MEGHAN BERTIROTTI VS LONGWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 MEGHAN BERTIROTTI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LONGWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. FAHEY, MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT, ROBERT B. BROADBELT and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5535

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERTIROTTI MEGHAN

Defendants

ABILITY HOMECARE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ADF INVESTMENTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ALDEN ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ARTESIA HEALTHCARE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BROADWAY MANOR CARE CENTER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BURBANK HEALTHCARE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BURLINGTON CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CANOGA HEALTHCARE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CASA BONITA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHINO VALLEY REHABILITATION CENTER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

COLDWATER CARE CENTER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

COLONIAL CARE CENTER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

COVINA CARE CENTER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CRENSHAW ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CROFTON MANOR ASSOCIATES L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

GREEN ACRES LODGE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HOSPICE CHEER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ICC CONVALESCENT CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

IMPERIAL CREST HEALTHCARE CENTER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RODRIGUEZ VANESSA

MATERN MATTHEW J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

JALIAN CHRIS ASHOD

 

Court Documents

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (SHARON CAHN, CSR #6210

4/29/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (SHARON CAHN, CSR #6210

Case Management Order

4/29/2022: Case Management Order

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/29/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address - CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS STIPULATION TO ACCEPT ELECTRONIC SERVICE

4/18/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address - CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS STIPULATION TO ACCEPT ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Case Management Statement

4/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement - CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AMENDED

4/14/2022: Case Management Statement - CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AMENDED

Case Management Statement

4/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • Hearing12/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Hearing08/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Sharon Cahn, CSR #6210); Filed by Alden Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Artesia Healthcare, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Broadway Manor Care Center, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Meghan Bertirotti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address (STIPULATION TO ACCEPT ELECTRONIC SERVICE); Filed by Longwood Management Corp., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Meghan Bertirotti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Related Case) of 01/28/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Meghan Bertirotti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Meghan Bertirotti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Meghan Bertirotti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Meghan Bertirotti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Meghan Bertirotti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Meghan Bertirotti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chino Valley Rehabilitation Center, LLC is a litigant