This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2022 at 18:35:56 (UTC).

MEGERDICH GHAZARDAVDIAN, BY AND THROUGH HIS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, KARMEN KARABEDIAN, ET AL. VS GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 MEGERDICH GHAZARDAVDIAN, BY AND THROUGH HIS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, KARMEN KARABEDIAN, filed an Other lawsuit against GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7875

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GHAZARDAVDIAN ADRINEH

GHAZARDAVDIAN BY AND THROUGH HIS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST KARMEN KARABEDIAN MEGERDICH

KARABEDIAN KARMEN

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHARIBIAN ART

Defendant Attorney

TROTTER MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/9/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/16/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/16/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/11/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

6/8/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/9/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Order

6/24/2022: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

6/28/2022: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KARMEN KARABEDIAN (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MEGERDICH GHAZARDAVDIAN PURSUANT TO CCP 377.32)

3/3/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KARMEN KARABEDIAN (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MEGERDICH GHAZARDAVDIAN PURSUANT TO CCP 377.32)

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/3/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/3/2022: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • Hearing05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • Hearing05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Megerdich Ghazardavdian, by and through his Successor-in-Interest, Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Adrineh Ghazardavdian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Glendale Adventist Medical Center dba Adventist Health Glendale Erroneously Sued As Glendale Adventist Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Glendale Adventist Medical Center dba Adventist Health Glendale Erroneously Sued As Glendale Adventist Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Megerdich Ghazardavdian, by and through his Successor-in-Interest, Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Adrineh Ghazardavdian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Megerdich Ghazardavdian, by and through his Successor-in-Interest, Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Adrineh Ghazardavdian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Megerdich Ghazardavdian, by and through his Successor-in-Interest, Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Adrineh Ghazardavdian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Megerdich Ghazardavdian, by and through his Successor-in-Interest, Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Adrineh Ghazardavdian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF KARMEN KARABEDIAN (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MEGERDICH GHAZARDAVDIAN PURSUANT TO CCP 377.32)); Filed by Megerdich Ghazardavdian, by and through his Successor-in-Interest, Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Adrineh Ghazardavdian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Megerdich Ghazardavdian, by and through his Successor-in-Interest, Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Adrineh Ghazardavdian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Megerdich Ghazardavdian, by and through his Successor-in-Interest, Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Karmen Karabedian (Plaintiff); Adrineh Ghazardavdian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less