This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2022 at 00:30:50 (UTC).

MEGAN D. ERASMUS VS SEDGH PLASTIC SURGERY, INC., A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 MEGAN D ERASMUS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SEDGH PLASTIC SURGERY, INC , A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1780

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERASMUS MEGAN D.

Defendant

SEDGH PLASTIC SURGERY INC. A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE

Defendant Attorney

KINSELLA DALE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/8/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

11/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail

12/7/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

12/29/2021: Answer

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

4/1/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

4/1/2022: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/22/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sedgh Plastic Surgery, Inc., a California Professional Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less