This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 10:02:02 (UTC).

MEGAN D. ERASMUS VS CHILDREN?S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 MEGAN D ERASMUS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CHILDREN S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3593

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERASMUS MEGAN D.

Defendants

CHILDREN?S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

CHILDREN?S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HANDY RUSSELL

HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/25/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

7/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

10/5/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

9/28/2021: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/16/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/3/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/1/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

9/1/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Entire Action, with prejudice); Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANDY RUSSELL ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE