This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 19:01:22 (UTC).

MEGAN D. ERASMUS VS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 MEGAN D ERASMUS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7623

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERASMUS MEGAN D.

Defendants

CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE

Defendant Attorney

CROUTCH TODD EVAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR STAY AND EARLY EVA...)

9/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR STAY AND EARLY EVA...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR STAY AND EARLY EVA...) OF 09/17/2021

9/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR STAY AND EARLY EVA...) OF 09/17/2021

Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility C - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONSTRUCTION-RELATED ACCESSIBILITY

9/17/2021: Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility C - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONSTRUCTION-RELATED ACCESSIBILITY

Defendant's Application for Stay and Early Evaluation Conference Pursuant to Civil Code Section 55 - DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR STAY AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 55.

9/3/2021: Defendant's Application for Stay and Early Evaluation Conference Pursuant to Civil Code Section 55 - DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR STAY AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 55.

Answer

9/3/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/28/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Hearing11/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Early Evaluation Conference (Construction Related Accessibility Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docketat 3:45 PM in Department 57; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Defendant's Application for Stay and Early Eva...) of 09/17/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Defendant's Application for Stay and Early Eva...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility Claim); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Application for Stay and Early Evaluation Conference Pursuant to Civil Code Section 55.54; Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, a California Nonprofit Corporation; (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System, a California Nonprofit Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, a California Nonprofit Corporation; (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Health System, a California Nonprofit Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Megan D. Erasmus (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEMS is a litigant

Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANDY RUSSELL CLIVE