This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2020 at 01:53:53 (UTC).

MEESO CHANG VS MARJORIE MCCOY ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 MEESO CHANG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARJORIE MCCOY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BENNY C. OSORIO, DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN and STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1872

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BENNY C. OSORIO

DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CHANG MEESO

Respondents, Defendants, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

EMERALD TERRACE PACIFIC OWNER LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE

MCCOY MARJORIE

Las Vegas, NV 89121

FAIRFIELD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

FAIRFIELD EMERALD TERRACE LLC (DOE 1)

FAIRFIELD EMERALD TERRACE LLC DOE 1

FF CALIFORNIA HOUSING FUND LLC

FF PROPERTIES INC.

MCCOY SHAWN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE MCCOY FAMILY TRUST

MCCOY ROMAINE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE MCCOY FAMILY TRUST

FAIRFIELD EMERALD TERRACE LLC DOE 1 - GOOD FAITH

FF PROPERTIES INC. - GOOD FAITH

EMERALD TERRACE PACIFIC OWNER LLC - GOOD FAITH

FF CALIFORNIA HOUSING FUND LLC - GOOD FAITH

MCCOY SHAWN

FF PROPERTIES INC.[DOE 2]

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

FAIRFIELD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

FF PROPERTIES LP DBA FAIRFIELD

FF PROPERTIES L.P.

FF PROPERTIES LP DBA FAIRFIELD - GOOD FAITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

WEINSTEIN ZEV Y.

SCHWIMER MICHAEL EVAN

Respondent, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ACKER STEPHEN ESQ.

ROSE ASHLEY D.

LEE DUSTIN JERAD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/26/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

8/13/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

Notice of Settlement

7/21/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

7/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 07/21/2020

7/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 07/21/2020

Notice of Ruling

7/15/2020: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF MARJORIE MCCOY AT DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,350.00 AND NON-MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHOR

7/15/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF MARJORIE MCCOY AT DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,350.00 AND NON-MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHOR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

7/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTEROGGATORIES, SET TWO; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION

7/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTEROGGATORIES, SET TWO; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER DECLARING THE GENUINENESS OF ANY DOCUMENTS AND THE TRUTH OF ANY MATTERS SPECIFIED IN PLAAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE; R

7/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER DECLARING THE GENUINENESS OF ANY DOCUMENTS AND THE TRUTH OF ANY MATTERS SPECIFIED IN PLAAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE; R

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION

7/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTEROGGATORIES, SET ONE; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION

7/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTEROGGATORIES, SET ONE; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS SHAWN MCCOY AND ROMAINE MCCOY; DECLARATION OF DUSTI

6/24/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS SHAWN MCCOY AND ROMAINE MCCOY; DECLARATION OF DUSTI

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS SHAWN MCCOY AND ROMAINE MCCOY

6/25/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS SHAWN MCCOY AND ROMAINE MCCOY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE HEAR...)

6/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE HEAR...)

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

6/15/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

6/15/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

6/15/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Meeso Chang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Not Entered); Filed by Meeso Chang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docketat 1:38 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Meeso Chang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: notice of settlement) of 07/21/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Appearance of Marjorie McCoy at Deposition and Request for Monetary Sanctions In The Amount of $1,350.00 And Non-Monetary Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof; And Declaration); Filed by Meeso Chang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by Meeso Chang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel ( RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Meeso Chang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Fairfield Property Management Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketFF PROPERTIES, LP DBA FAIRFIELD PROPERTIES, LP. A DELAWARE CORPORATION;ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Meeso Chang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Meeso Chang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketSummons 100

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Meeso Chang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****1872    Hearing Date: July 14, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

meeso chang,

Plaintiff,

v.

marjorie mccoy, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****1872

Hearing Date: July 14, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motionS to compel discovery responses

Plaintiff Meeso Chang (“Plaintiff”) moves to compel responses from Defendant Marjorie McCoy to: (1) Request for Production of Documents, Set One (“RPD”); and (2) Form Interrogatories, Sets One and Two (“FROGs”). Plaintiff served the RPDs by mail on April 10, 2020. Plaintiff served the FROGs by mail on May 1, 2019, and April 10, 2020. As of the filing date of these motions, Plaintiff has not received responses from Defendant. Defendant does not oppose these motions, and there is nothing in the record suggesting that Defendant has complied with her discovery obligations. Therefore, the motions are granted.

Plaintiff also moves to deem the matters specified in the Requests for Admission, Set One (“RFAs”) to be admitted, which were served the RFAs by mail on April 10, 2020. Where a party fails to respond to requests for admissions, the propounding party may move for an order that the genuineness of any documents and the truth of any matters specified in the requests be deemed admitted, as well as for a monetary sanction. (Code of Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subd. (b).) The court “shall” grant a motion to deem admitted the matters specified in the requests for admissions, “unless it finds that the party to whom the requests for admission have been directed has served, before the hearing on the motion, a proposed response to the requests for admission that is in substantial compliance with Section 2033.220.” (Code of Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subd. (c).) As Defendant has failed to respond to the RFAs and does not oppose the motion, the Court deems the matters specified in the RFAs to have been admitted.

Plaintiff seeks sanctions against Defendant (but not Defendant’s counsel) in connection with the motions. The Court concludes that Defendant’s failure to respond to the discovery is an abuse of the discovery process. The Court awards sanctions against Defendant in the amount of $1,746.60, based upon five hours of attorney time at a rate of $250 per hour plus four filing fees of $61.65 each.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Plaintiff’s motions to compel responses to the RPD and FROGs are granted per

Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300. Defendant is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, within thirty (30) days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff’s motion to deem admitted is granted. Defendant is deemed to have admitted the truth of all matters specified in the RFAs as of this date.

Defendant (but not Defendant’s counsel) is ordered to pay monetary sanctions in the amount of $1,746.60 to Plaintiff, by and through counsel, within thirty (30) days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: July 14, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAIRFIELD PROPERTY MANAGEMEN is a litigant

Latest cases where Emerald Terrace Pacific Owner LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FAIRFIELD EMERALD TERRACE LLC (DOE 1) is a litigant

Latest cases where MCROY FAMILY TRUST is a litigant