This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/23/2023 at 05:35:32 (UTC).

MEESA BRADLEY VS MAKE-UP ART COSMETICS, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 MEESA BRADLEY filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MAKE-UP ART COSMETICS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7919

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRADLEY MEESA

Defendant

MAKE-UP ART COSMETICS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARZAM JOSEPH S ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LE KATHY A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

12/6/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION - PLEADINGS]

12/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION - PLEADINGS]

Notice of Settlement

10/25/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REJECTION OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

10/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REJECTION OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REJECTION OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;) OF 10/26/2021

10/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REJECTION OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;) OF 10/26/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE REMOVAL TO F...)

4/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE REMOVAL TO F...)

Case Management Statement

3/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/8/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

12/22/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/23/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

12/29/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

11/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/3/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection - Pleadings]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Status Date changed from 10/25/2021 to 10/25/2021; Filed By: Meesa Bradley (Plaintiff); Result: Vacated; Result Date: 10/26/2021; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Rejection of Notice of Settlement;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Rejection of Notice of Settlement;) of 10/26/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Meesa Bradley (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re Removal to F...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 04/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference Re Removal to Federal Court scheduled for 04/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 updated: Result Date to 04/08/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/08/2021 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Joseph S Farzam, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketAddress for Joseph S Farzam, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Meesa Bradley (Plaintiff); As to: Make-Up Art Cosmetics, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Meesa Bradley (Plaintiff); As to: Make-Up Art Cosmetics, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Meesa Bradley (Plaintiff); As to: Make-Up Art Cosmetics, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara M. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less