This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 17:54:16 (UTC).

MEENA KHAN VS WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 MEENA KHAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2752

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHAN MEENA

Defendant

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRUZEN ERIC M.

Defendant Attorney

BERKOWITZ PAUL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/19/2022, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

10/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/19/2022, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

Case Management Statement

10/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/7/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/7/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/22/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK N.A TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/2/2022: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK N.A TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

8/8/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Remand from Federal Court

8/16/2022: Notice of Remand from Federal Court

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/14/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/14/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/15/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • Hearing07/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • Hearing06/29/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 07/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/29/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/19/2022, Final Trial Preparation; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/24/2022 at 10:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Meena Khan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Meena Khan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketAddress for Eric M. Gruzen (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/15/2022 at 10:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/24/2022 at 10:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Meena Khan (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Meena Khan (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Meena Khan (Plaintiff); As to: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less