This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2021 at 08:43:28 (UTC).

MEDYGATE, INC. VS PACIFIC GARDENS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 MEDYGATE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PACIFIC GARDENS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1081

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDYGATE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

PACIFIC GARDENS MEDICAL CENTER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHABEL SCOTT LEE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/19/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

7/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

7/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

7/30/2020: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (STANISLAUS)

8/3/2020: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (STANISLAUS)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATES) OF 05/07/2020

5/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATES) OF 05/07/2020

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

5/27/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

5/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/21/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE USE OF COPIES

1/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE USE OF COPIES

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT

1/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/23/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

12/23/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/19/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/19/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/14/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/14/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/14/2019: Complaint

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Stanislaus)); Filed by Medygate, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by Medygate, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 39; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Entry Of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Entry Of Default Judgment) of 07/21/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Medygate, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration Re Use of Copies); Filed by Medygate, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Medygate, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Medygate, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Medygate, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Medygate, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Medygate, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC GARDENS MEDICAL CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHABEL SCOTT LEE ESQ.