This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 18:55:25 (UTC).

MEDINA, LUIS ALONSO VS SORTO MEJIA, DANIELA STEPHANIE

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 MEDINA, LUIS ALONSO filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SORTO MEJIA, DANIELA STEPHANIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KIM, ESTHER P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0560

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KIM, ESTHER P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEDINA LUIS ALONSO

Respondent

SORTO MEJIA DANIELA STEPHANIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NGUYEN DON V

Respondent Attorneys

LEVINE KENZIE

LEVINE CHRISTIANA DANIELLE MACKENZIE

LEVINE CHRISTIANA DANIELLE

 

Court Documents

Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

8/9/2021: Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

Facsimile Transmission Cover Sheet

8/9/2021: Facsimile Transmission Cover Sheet

Minute Order

7/27/2021: Minute Order

Witness List

7/15/2021: Witness List

Proof of Service - declaration of service

7/15/2021: Proof of Service - declaration of service

Minute Order

7/16/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - with amended Dv-110; amended Dv-140; and Stipulation and Order

7/16/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - with amended Dv-110; amended Dv-140; and Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order

7/16/2021: Stipulation and Order

Witness List

7/16/2021: Witness List

Minute Order

7/16/2021: Minute Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Corrected 7/15/2021

6/7/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Corrected 7/15/2021

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Corrected 7/15/2021

6/7/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Corrected 7/15/2021

Miscellaneous - Petitioners evidentiary objections to respondents response to request for domestic violence restraining.

7/7/2021: Miscellaneous - Petitioners evidentiary objections to respondents response to request for domestic violence restraining.

Proof of Service - Mail

7/7/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

6/7/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/7/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

6/7/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 1, Kim, Esther P., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 1, Kim, Esther P., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 1, Kim, Esther P., Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Corrected 7/15/2021 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE KENZIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE CHRISTIANA DANIELLE MACKENZIE