This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2021 at 23:33:38 (UTC).

MEDICAL ASSOCIATES VS MDSM GROUP, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 MEDICAL ASSOCIATES filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against MDSM GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2056

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDICAL ASSOCIATES DBA THE MEDICAL CENTRE OF SANTA MONICA

Defendants

GIBBON GARY

MDSM GROUP INC

BERNARD WEINTRAUB M.D. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SWEARINGEN JAMES L.

SWEARINGEN JAMES LEONARD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: 585 PACKAGE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DI...)

5/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: 585 PACKAGE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: 585 PACKAGE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DI...) OF 05/21/2021

5/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: 585 PACKAGE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DI...) OF 05/21/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION)

1/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION) OF 01/08/2021

1/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION) OF 01/08/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION)

9/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE ENTRY OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT;)

4/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE ENTRY OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE ENTRY OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT;) OF 04/01/2020

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE ENTRY OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT;) OF 04/01/2020

Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY

3/20/2020: Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

3/20/2020: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/13/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/19/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

2/19/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/30/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/2/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/10/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

12/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/10/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

12/3/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Status Conference (Re585 Package) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal ((Failure to Prosecute)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: 585 Package; Order to Show Cause Re: Di...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Re: 585 Package; Order to Show Cause Re: Di...) of 05/21/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment for Possession) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment for Possession) of 01/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment for Possession)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment for Possession) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment for Possession)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Bernard Weintraub M.D. Inc.)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Gary Gibbon)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((MDSM Group, Inc)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Medical Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Medical Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketComplaint (- Unlawful Detainer); Filed by Medical Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDICAL ASSOCIATES BREVARD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWEARINGEN JAMES L.