This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2022 at 19:01:43 (UTC).

MEDIARIF CORPORATION VS RAIN BIRD CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 MEDIARIF CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAIN BIRD CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1529

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

MEDIARIF CORPORATION

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

RAIN BIRD CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

JACOB ANDREW M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HUA JING

Cross Defendant Attorney

MERTENS JOHN P.

 

Court Documents

Answer

8/27/2020: Answer

Complaint

6/8/2020: Complaint

Answer

7/30/2020: Answer

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

2/14/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

2/2/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER

7/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT)

1/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT) OF 01/27/2022

1/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT) OF 01/27/2022

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/9/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

10/30/2020: Case Management Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES RAIN BIRD CORPORATION

11/2/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES RAIN BIRD CORPORATION

Case Management Statement

10/14/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

10/5/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

10/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JING (JENNY) HUA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ANDREW M. JACOBS FOR ADMISSION AS COUNSEL IN THIS ACTION FOR DEFENDANT RAIN BIRD CORPO

7/31/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JING (JENNY) HUA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ANDREW M. JACOBS FOR ADMISSION AS COUNSEL IN THIS ACTION FOR DEFENDANT RAIN BIRD CORPO

Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

7/31/2020: Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Rain Bird Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MediaRif Corporation (Plaintiff); Rain Bird Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Status Conference (re Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re Settlement) of 01/27/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Order); Filed by MediaRif Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by MediaRif Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (Rain Bird Corporation); Filed by Rain Bird Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMotion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by Rain Bird Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jing (Jenny) Hua in Support of Motion for Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application of Andrew M. Jacobs for Admission as Counsel in this Action for Defendant Rain Bird Corporation); Filed by Rain Bird Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Rain Bird Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rain Bird Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MediaRif Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MediaRif Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MediaRif Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MediaRif Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1529    Hearing Date: October 01, 2020    Dept: 24

Andrew M. Jacobs’s application to be admitted as counsel pro hac vice for Defendant/Cross-Complainant Rain Bird Corp. is GRANTED.

On June 8, 2020, Plaintiff Mediarif Corp. brought the instant contract/fraud suit against Defendant Rain Bird Corp. On July 30, 2020, Defendant answered and filed a cross-Complaint against Plaintiff.

On July 31, 2020, Andrew M. Jacobs filed the instant application to appear as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant/Cross-Complainant. No opposition was submitted.

Discussion

CRC Rule 9.40 provides that an attorney in good standing in another jurisdiction may apply to appear pro hac vice in this State by way of written application upon due notice to all interested parties, as well as service on the State Bar in San Francisco with payment of a $50.00 fee, so long as that attorney is not a resident of California, does not work in California and does not perform regular or substantial business, professional or other activities in the State.

The written application must provide the following information: (1) applicant attorney’s residence and office addresses; (2) the courts to which the applicant attorney has been admitted and dates of admission; (3) a representation that the attorney applicant is a member in good standing in the courts of admission and is not currently suspended or disbarred in any court; (4) the title of each court and action in which the applicant attorney has appeared pro hac vice in this State in the preceding two years, if any; and (5) the name, address, and telephone number of the active California State Bar member who is counsel of record in the local action. (CRC Rule 9.40(d).)

The application satisfies rule 9.40. The declarations supplied sufficient information to satisfy the requirements. (Hua Decl., ¶¶ 1-3; Jacobs Decl., generally.) Accordingly, the application is GRANTED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rain Bird Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Phillip Mertens