This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 14:17:57 (UTC).

MEDIA CROWD, INC. VS PRVT HOLDINGS CORP.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2018 MEDIA CROWD, INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against PRVT HOLDINGS CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7545

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDIA CROWD INC.

Defendants

PRVT HOLDINGS CORP.

KAMRAN KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOPER JUDE C.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/19/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/19/2018: Complaint

Legacy Document

6/7/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

6/7/2018: Legacy Document

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/30/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/1/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

8/31/2018: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Legacy Document

8/31/2018: Legacy Document

Case Management Statement

10/9/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

10/16/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/16/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order

1/10/2019: Minute Order

Declaration re: Due Diligence

2/7/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Ex Parte Application

4/9/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

4/10/2019: Minute Order

Order for Publication

4/25/2019: Order for Publication

Notice

5/31/2019: Notice

Proof of Personal Service

5/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Plaintiff Media Crowd, Inc.'s Petition to Confirm Arbitration...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MEDIA CROWD, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by MEDIA CROWD, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketAmended Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by MEDIA CROWD, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketOrder for Publication; Filed by JUDE C. COOPER (Attorney); MEDIA CROWD, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by MEDIA CROWD, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by MEDIA CROWD, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by MEDIA CROWD, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MEDIA CROWD, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRVT HOLDINGS CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cooper, Jude C