This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 01:14:04 (UTC).

MCWIL SPORTS SURFACES INC VS CHRIS KELLY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 MCWIL SPORTS SURFACES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRIS KELLY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9750

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

MCWIL SPORTS SURFACES INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF

CHRIS KELLEY INC.

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

PLAY CHILD'S

Respondent and Defendant

PLAY CHILD'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FEUER MICHAEL NELSON

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

AZZARA PHILIP JOSEPH

Cross Defendant Attorney

BUCHANAN NATASHA KAMDAR

Other Attorneys

PETERSON GAIL DENISE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/22/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

1/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer - ANSWER CROSS-DEF MCWILL SPORTS SURFACES, INC'S ANSWER TO CHRIS KELLEY, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/31/2019: Answer - ANSWER CROSS-DEF MCWILL SPORTS SURFACES, INC'S ANSWER TO CHRIS KELLEY, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT 1ST

4/29/2019: Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT 1ST

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/13/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

2/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/28/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Case Management Statement

1/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/28/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/29/2019: Case Management Statement

CITY OF LOS ANGELES' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

9/20/2018: CITY OF LOS ANGELES' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Cross-Complaint

11/20/2018: Cross-Complaint

Answer

11/20/2018: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/20/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by McWil Sports Surfaces, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Chris Kelley, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketAnswer (Cross-Def McWill Sports Surfaces, Inc's Answer to Chris Kelley, Inc.'s First Amended Cross-Complaint); Filed by McWil Sports Surfaces, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint (1st); Filed by Chris Kelley, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Chris Kelley, Inc. (Defendant); Child's Play (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Chris Kelley, Inc. (Defendant); Child's Play (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles Department of (Legacy Party); Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by McWil Sports Surfaces, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by McWil Sports Surfaces, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by McWil Sports Surfaces, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less