This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2023 at 21:59:13 (UTC).

MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS 900 GAYLEY AVENUE ASSOCIATES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 900 GAYLEY AVENUE ASSOCIATES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2756

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCSHANE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

10966 LE CONTE AVENUE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

900 GAYLEY AVENUE ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ALL PRO BUILDING MAINTENANCE SERVICE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ART DECK INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

B & F SUPPLY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BANK OF HOPE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ECO GLASS SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

EVANSTON ROAD LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GREENLEAF ENGINEERING A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

J GINGER MASONRY L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

LYNN SAFETY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OJ INSULATION L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

PACIFIC COAST CLEANING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PLUMP ENGINEERING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SCHINDLER ELEVATOR CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

SCOBAR ADVENTURES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SQUAT LIKE A HEN LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIGGEN SAMANTHA

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/16/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION

12/20/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION

Notice of Lis Pendens

12/28/2022: Notice of Lis Pendens

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2023
  • Hearing06/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: McShane Construction Company LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION; Filed by: McShane Construction Company LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: 900 Gayley Avenue Associates, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark H. Epstein in Department R Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: McShane Construction Company LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: 900 Gayley Avenue Associates, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Scobar Adventures, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Evanston Road, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: McShane Construction Company LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: 900 Gayley Avenue Associates, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Scobar Adventures, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Evanston Road, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: McShane Construction Company LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: 900 Gayley Avenue Associates, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Scobar Adventures, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Evanston Road, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less