This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2021 at 18:59:28 (UTC).

MCKENDRY, SCOTT A. VS MCKENDRY, TERRY S.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 MCKENDRY, SCOTT A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MCKENDRY, TERRY S. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY, CHARLES Q.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1150

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY, CHARLES Q.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCKENDRY SCOTT A.

Claimant

WESTERN CONFERENCE OF TEAMSTERS PENSION TRUST

Respondent

MCKENDRY TERRY S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

REYNA CARINA MICHELLE

POURMORADY KOUROSH

 

Court Documents

Judgment

6/14/2021: Judgment

Notice - Entry of Judgment

6/14/2021: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

6/14/2021: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Declaration - Default FL170

6/14/2021: Declaration - Default FL170

Minute Order

6/14/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

4/12/2021: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

3/2/2021: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

3/2/2021: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Minute Order

3/3/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/22/2021: Minute Order

Request - Trial Setting

1/22/2021: Request - Trial Setting

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Status and Trial Setting Conference

1/25/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Status and Trial Setting Conference

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Status and Trial Setting Conference

1/25/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Status and Trial Setting Conference

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Status and Trial Setting Conference

1/25/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Status and Trial Setting Conference

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Status and Trial Setting Conference

1/25/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Status and Trial Setting Conference

Minute Order

2/3/2021: Minute Order

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Set aside per 12/4/2020 court order

10/1/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Set aside per 12/4/2020 court order

Judgment - Set Aside per 12/4/2020 order

10/21/2020: Judgment - Set Aside per 12/4/2020 order

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • Docketat 9:30 AM in Department 202, Clay, Charles Q., Presiding; Short Cause Trial - Judgment - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketJudgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 202, Clay, Charles Q., Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 202, Clay, Charles Q., Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Not Settled, Trial Set

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (Set aside per 12/4/2020 court order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN CONFERENCE OF TEAMSTERS PENSION TRUST FUND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYNA CARINA MICHELLE