This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 16:24:34 (UTC).

MCCLAMMY, DEROLD WAYNE, III VS MCCLAMMY, RANDY KIT

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 MCCLAMMY, DEROLD WAYNE, III filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MCCLAMMY, RANDY KIT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1326

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCCLAMMY DEROLD WAYNE III

Respondent

MCCLAMMY RANDY KIT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

STERNBERG CAROL

STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

8/26/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

8/26/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

8/26/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

8/26/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

8/26/2021: Summons

Proof of Service of Summons - Served 09/07/2021 attached FL-117

9/15/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - Served 09/07/2021 attached FL-117

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses)

3/15/2022: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses)

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

4/7/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

4/14/2022: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

4/14/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

4/14/2022: Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notices)

6/6/2022: Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notices)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

6/2/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Notice - Entry of Judgment

5/13/2022: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Declaration - Default FL170

5/13/2022: Declaration - Default FL170

Judgment

5/13/2022: Judgment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notices) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation (Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Served 09/07/2021 attached FL-117 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROL