Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2021 at 10:24:56 (UTC).

MCCANN, KATHLEEN VS FISHER, JAMISON ALEJANDRO

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 MCCANN, KATHLEEN filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against FISHER, JAMISON ALEJANDRO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COPS, JENNIFER H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1129

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COPS, JENNIFER H.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCCANN KATHLEEN

Respondent

FISHER JAMISON ALEJANDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/22/2020: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

9/29/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

9/29/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Proof of Service - CH-116 AND CH-115

9/25/2020: Proof of Service - CH-116 AND CH-115

Response - Civil Harassment

9/25/2020: Response - Civil Harassment

Proof of Service - Mail - CH-120

9/25/2020: Proof of Service - Mail - CH-120

Minute Order

9/29/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Service

8/27/2020: Proof of Service

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

9/1/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

9/2/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - ADDENDUM

8/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - ADDENDUM

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

8/18/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

8/18/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Petition - Civil Harassment

8/18/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

8/18/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Cops, Jennifer H., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Cops, Jennifer H., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (CH-120 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (CH-116 AND CH-115 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (ADDENDUM )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.