This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 04:08:07 (UTC).

MAYNOR GALINDO VS PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 MAYNOR GALINDO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8806

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALINDO MAYNOR

Defendants

PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY

PHILLIPS 66 PIPELINE LLC

PHILLIPS 66 SPECTRUM CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SETAREH SHAUN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

11/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

10/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Maynor Galindo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maynor Galindo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maynor Galindo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maynor Galindo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maynor Galindo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maynor Galindo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maynor Galindo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Phillip 66 Pipeline LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PHILLIP 66 COMPANY is a litigant