Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2020 at 02:25:15 (UTC).

MAYELA CONTRERAS , ET AL. VS LAST MANAGEMENT PROPERTY

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 MAYELA CONTRERAS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LAST MANAGEMENT PROPERTY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0037

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CONTRERAS MAYELA

VALLE VILLALOBOS RAMIRO

Defendants

LAST PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC

RUBIO JUAN

LAST MANAGEMENT PROPERTY

LAST MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANCHEZ SIQUEIROS ABRAHAM A

515 S. Flower St.

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

KALTENBACH JOHN JOSEPH

PATTON HILLARY DRENNAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF...)

8/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF...)

Notice of Ruling

8/21/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUSPENDED TRIAL)

6/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE SUSPENDED TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING)

4/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING)

Motion for Terminating Sanctions

3/25/2020: Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/18/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion for Terminating Sanctions

1/24/2020: Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Motion for Terminating Sanctions

1/24/2020: Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF RAMIRO VALLE'S RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND A

12/11/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF RAMIRO VALLE'S RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND A

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VANESSA GOMEZ'S RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND

12/12/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VANESSA GOMEZ'S RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VANESSA GOMEZ'S RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; MEMORANDU

12/12/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VANESSA GOMEZ'S RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; MEMORANDU

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF EMILY RODRIGUEZ'S RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS

12/12/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF EMILY RODRIGUEZ'S RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF EMILY RODRIGUEZ'S RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN

12/12/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF EMILY RODRIGUEZ'S RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN

Notice of Consolidation - NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION HEARING DATES FOR MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

12/12/2019: Notice of Consolidation - NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION HEARING DATES FOR MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/3/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

5/15/2019: Case Management Statement

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/18/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

1/18/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions/Dismissal for Plaintiffs' Failure to Serve/File Proof of Service) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS ORDER TO SHOW CA...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Last Management, LLC, a California Liability company (Defendant); Last Property Mangmnt LLC Erroneously Sued As Last Property Management, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions (Against Plaintiff Emily Rodriguez (Orig. Date 5/22/20)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions (Against Vanessa Gomez (Orig. Date 5/8/20)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions (Against Ramiro Valle Villalobos (Orig. Date 4/29/20)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions (Against Alexandra Valle (Orig. Date 4/30/20)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions (Against Lizbette Gomez (Orig. Date 5/21/20)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Last Property Mangmnt LLC Erroneously Sued As Last Property Management, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mayela Contreras (Plaintiff); Ramiro Valle Villalobos (Plaintiff); Vanessa Gomez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Mayela Contreras (Plaintiff); Ramiro Valle Villalobos (Plaintiff); Vanessa Gomez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mayela Contreras (Plaintiff); Ramiro Valle Villalobos (Plaintiff); Vanessa Gomez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Mayela Contreras (Plaintiff); Ramiro Valle Villalobos (Plaintiff); Vanessa Gomez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Mayela Contreras (Plaintiff); Ramiro Valle Villalobos (Plaintiff); Vanessa Gomez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mayela Contreras (Plaintiff); Ramiro Valle Villalobos (Plaintiff); Vanessa Gomez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Mayela Contreras (Plaintiff); Ramiro Valle Villalobos (Plaintiff); Vanessa Gomez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Mayela Contreras (Plaintiff); Ramiro Valle Villalobos (Plaintiff); Vanessa Gomez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19CHCV00037    Hearing Date: September 28, 2020    Dept: F47

Dept. F-47

Date: 9/28/20

Case #19CHCV00037

MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Motion filed on 8/21/20.

MOVING PARTY: Defendants Last Management, LLC and Last Property Mangmnt

RESPONDING PARTY: Plaintiff Ramiro Valle

Notice: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order imposing terminating sanctions to dismiss Plaintiff Ramiro Valle’s case and monetary sanctions against Plaintiff and his/her attorney of record in the amount of $540.00.

RULING: The unopposed motion is granted as set forth below.

On 2/14/20, this Court granted Defendants Last Management, LLC and Last Property Mangmnt’s motions to compel responses to Form Interrogatories, Set 1; Special Interrogatories, Set 1, and Demand for Production of Documents, Set 1. Plaintiff Ramiro Valle

was ordered to provide responses within 20 days and to pay $680 in sanctions, also within 20 days. (See 2/14/20 Minute Order). Notice of the ruling was provided on 2/14/20. (Patton Decl. ¶4, Ex.A). Plaintiff has failed to serve responses or pay the sanctions. (Patton Decls. ¶5).

Based on Plaintiff’s failure to comply with this Court’s discovery orders, these Defendants are entitled to an order imposing terminating sanctions against Plaintiff plus additional monetary sanctions. CCP 2030.290(c); CCP 2031.300(c); CCP 2023.010(g); CCP 2023.030(a); CCP 2023.030(d)(3). In addition to dismissing Plaintiff Ramiro Valle’s case against Defendants Last Management, LLC and Last Property Mangmnt, monetary sanctions in the amount of $500.00 are imposed against Plaintiff Ramiro and his attorney of record, Abraham A. Sanchez Siqueiros.

Case Number: 19CHCV00037    Hearing Date: August 21, 2020    Dept: F47

Dept. F-47

Date: 8/21/20

Case #19CHCV00037

5 MOTIONS FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Motions filed on 3/25/20.

MOVING PARTY: Defendants Last Management, LLC and Last Property Mangmnt

RESPONDING PARTY # 1: Plaintiff Lizbette Gomez

RESPONDING PARTY # 2: Plaintiff Vanessa Gomez

RESPONDING PARTY # 3: Plaintiff Emily Rodriguez

RESPONDING PARTY # 4: Plaintiff Ramiro Valle Villalobos*

RESPONDING PARTY # 5: Plaintiff Alexandra Villalobos

Notice: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED: Orders imposing terminating sanctions to dismiss Plaintiffs Lizbette Gomez, Vanessa Gomez, Emily Rodriguez, Ramiro Valle Villalobos* and Alexandra Valle’s case and monetary sanctions against each Plaintiff and his/her attorney of record in the amount of $540.00.

RULING: The unopposed motions are granted as set forth below.

On 2/14/20, this Court granted Defendants Last Management, LLC and Last Property Mangmnt’s motions to compel responses to Form Interrogatories, Set 1; Special Interrogatories, Set 1, and Demand for Production of Documents, Set 1. Plaintiffs Lizbette Gomez, Vanessa Gomez, Emily Rodriguez, Ramiro Valle Villalobos* and Alexandra Valle were ordered to provide responses within 20 days and to pay $680 in sanctions, also within 20 days. (See 2/14/20 Minute Order). Notice of the rulings was provided on 2/14/20. (Patton Decls. ¶4, Ex.A). Plaintiffs have failed to serve responses or pay the sanctions. (Patton Decls. ¶5).

Based on Plaintiffs’ failure to comply with this Court’s discovery orders, these Defendants are entitled to an order imposing terminating sanctions against Plaintiffs plus additional monetary sanctions. CCP 2030.290(c); CCP 2031.300(c); CCP 2023.010(g); CCP 2023.030(a); CCP 2023.030(d)(3). In addition to dismissing Plaintiffs Lizbette Gomez, Vanessa Gomez, Emily Rodriguez, Ramiro Valle Villalobos* and Alexandra Valle’s case against Defendants Last Management, LLC and Last Property Mangmnt, monetary sanctions in the amount of $500.00 are imposed against each of these Plaintiffs and their attorney of record, Abraham A. Sanchez Siqueiros. In other words, the attorney is jointly and severally liable for the $500.00 imposed on each Plaintiff.

*The motion for terminating sanctions addresses Plaintiff Ramiro Valle Villalobos; however, the underlying motion to compel at issue addressed Plaintiff Ramiro Valle. A motion for terminating sanctions as to Plaintiff Ramiro Valle Villalobos was heard on 8/18/20.

Case Number: 19CHCV00037    Hearing Date: August 18, 2020    Dept: F47

Dept. F-47

Date: 8/18/20

Case #19CHCV00037

2 MOTIONS FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Motions filed on 1/24/20.

MOVING PARTY: Defendants Last Management, LLC and Last Property Management, LLC

RESPONDING PARTY # 1: Plaintiff Mayela Contreras

RESPONDING PARTY # 2: Plaintiff Ramiro Valle Villalobos

Notice: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order imposing terminating sanctions to dismiss Plaintiffs Mayela Contreras and Ramiro Valle Villalobos’ case and monetary sanctions against each Plaintiff and his/her attorney of record in the amount of $810.00.

RULING: The unopposed motions are granted as set forth below.

On 10/25/19, this Court granted Defendants Last Management, LLC and Last Property Management, LLC’s motions to compel responses to Form Interrogatories, Set 1; Special Interrogatories, Set 1, and Demand for Production of Documents, Set 1. Plaintiffs Mayela Contreras and Ramiro Valle Villalobos were ordered to provide responses within 20 days and to pay $500 in sanctions, also within 20 days. (See 10/25/19 Minute Order). Notice of the ruling was provided on 10/25/19. (Carpenter Decls. ¶4, Ex.A). Plaintiffs have failed to serve responses or pay the sanctions. (Carpenter Decl. ¶5).

Based on Plaintiffs’ failure to comply with this Court’s discovery orders, these Defendants are entitled to an order imposing terminating sanctions against Plaintiffs plus additional monetary sanctions. CCP 2030.290(c); CCP 2031.300(c); CCP 2023.010(g); CCP 2023.030(a); CCP 2023.030(d)(3). In addition to dismissing Plaintiffs Mayela Contreras’ and Ramiro Valle Villalobos’ cases against Defendants Last Management, LLC and Last Property Management, LLC, monetary sanctions in the amount of $500.00 are imposed against each of these Plaintiffs and their attorney of record, Abraham A. Sanchez Siqueiros. In other words, the attorney is jointly and severally liable for the $500.00 imposed on each Plaintiff.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAST PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LAST MANAGEMENT LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANCHEZ SIQUEIROS ABRAHAM A