This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2020 at 04:41:22 (UTC).

MAXINE HARRIS VS GRANDVIEW MARKET INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 MAXINE HARRIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GRANDVIEW MARKET INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4225

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HARRIS MAXINE

Defendants and Respondents

GRANDVIEW MARKET INC

DOES 1 TO 50

GRANDVIEW MARKET

YANG SU-QIN

ARIF AFTAB

LAM VAN SAU (DOE 4)

AFTAB SHAMSA AN INDIVIDUAL (DOE 1)

TOY G DONALD (DOE 5)

AFTAB ARIF (DOE 2)

PHANG CHANH MY (DOE 3)

PHANG CHANH MY DOE 3

AFTAB ARIF DOE 2

AFTAB SHAMSA AN INDIVIDUAL DOE 1

LAM VAN SAU DOE 4

TOY G DONALD DOE 5

AFTAB DOE 1 SHAMSA

PHANG DOE 3 CHANH MY

LAM DOE 4 VAN SAU

GRANDVIEW MARKET INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S. ESQ.

ZUCKERMAN PAUL STUART

Defendant Attorneys

CORDERO SACKS ADA RITA

CORDERO-SACKS ADA R

 

Court Documents

Default Judgment

9/23/2020: Default Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF JUNE 15, 2020 HEARING)

4/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF JUNE 15, 2020 HEARING)

Request for Refund / Order

12/2/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Proof of Service by Mail

11/27/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

11/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

11/27/2019: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Request for Judicial Notice

11/14/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

11/14/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Order - Dismissal

10/30/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5))

10/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

9/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default

9/13/2019: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/24/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/24/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/11/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

5/18/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal for failure to enter default judgments) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Maxine Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal for failure to enter default judgments) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Docketat 11:06 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Continuance of June 15, 2020 Hearing) of 04/21/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Continuance of June 15, 2020 Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal for failure to enter default judgments) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for failure to enter defaul...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maxine Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maxine Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maxine Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694225    Hearing Date: October 24, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

MAXINE HARRIS,

Plaintiff,

v.

GRANDVIEW MARKET INC., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC694225

Hearing Date: October 24, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to set aside default

Defendant G. Donald Toy (“Defendant”) seeks relief from the default Plaintiff Maxine Harris (“Plaintiff”) took against Defendant on July 24, 2019. Defendant proffers his own declaration, in which he states that he does not, and has never, lived at 1224 Grandview Avenue in Rosemead, California, where Plaintiff purportedly served Defendant. Defendant became the owner of the property by court order on February 5, 2018, but has never rented the property to anyone, as it requires significant renovations. Defendant states that he does not know John Wong, the person with whom Plaintiff left the summons and complaint. (Declaration of G. Donald Troy, ¶¶ 4-6; see Proof of Service of Summons, filed June 8, 2018.) The motion is not opposed. Therefore, the Court grants the motion, per Code of Civil Procedure section 473.5.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The Court grants the motion to set aside entry of default. The Court sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: October 14, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: October 31, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The motions and discovery cut-off shall be governed by this trial date. The Court vacates the Order to Show Cause Hearing and Trial Setting Conference on October 30, 2019, at 8:30 a.m. The Court’s clerk shall provide notice.

DATED: October 24, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court