This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2019 at 02:05:50 (UTC).

MAXIMILIANO MARTINEZ VS ROBERTO SANCHEZ ACOSTA ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/17/2018 MAXIMILIANO MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERTO SANCHEZ ACOSTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2251

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MARTINEZ MAXIMILIANO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-20

DOES 21-30

ROBERT'S TRUCKING INC

ACOSTA ROBERTO SANCHEZ

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STAPKE MARK R. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MCDONALD TIMOTHY PATRICK

SOLEIMANIAN HAMID ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/24/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

4/24/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR:ASSAULT;AND NEGLIGENCE

5/8/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR:ASSAULT;AND NEGLIGENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/18/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/18/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Answer

7/10/2018: Answer

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/5/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEMURRER & MOTION TO STRIKE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/5/2018: DEMURRER & MOTION TO STRIKE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

9/5/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

9/7/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Demand for Jury Trial

10/11/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

10/11/2018: Answer

Declaration

3/18/2019: Declaration

Motion to Compel

3/18/2019: Motion to Compel

Separate Statement

3/18/2019: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel

3/18/2019: Motion to Compel

Minute Order

4/19/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

4/17/2018: SUMMONS

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Request for Production) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Special Interrogatories) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • at 10:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts (- Resolved); Filed by Roberto Sanchez Acosta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration of Eduardo Balderas); Filed by Roberto Sanchez Acosta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Separate Statement (Request for Production); Filed by Roberto Sanchez Acosta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Motion to Compel (Request for Production); Filed by Roberto Sanchez Acosta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Motion to Compel (Special Interrogatories); Filed by Roberto Sanchez Acosta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Roberto Sanchez Acosta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Maximiliano Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR:ASSAULT;AND NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Maximiliano Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Maximiliano Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Maximiliano Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC702251    Hearing Date: February 21, 2020    Dept: 32

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

maximilliano martinez,

Plaintiff,

v.

roberto sanchez acosta, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC702251

Hearing Date: February 21, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

Defendant’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Defendant Roberto Sanchez Acosta (“Defendant”) moves to continue the trial date, currently set for April 22, 2020, to June 22, 2020. In its order of January 8, 2020, the Court granted Defendant’s ex parte application to continue the trial date to April 22, 2020. The Court notified the parties that it would not permit further continuances. In this case, however, Defendant has demonstrated that he noticed Plaintiff’s deposition for January 21, 2020, but on January 18, 2020, Plaintiff cancelled the deposition because Plaintiff’s counsel was hospitalized. Plaintiff has not yet appeared for deposition. This constitutes good cause to continue the trial, notwithstanding the Court’s prior order that there shall be no further continuances.

Also, Defendant noticed an independent medical examination of Plaintiff for December 30, 2019, which Plaintiff cancelled. The earliest date available for an independent medical examination of Plaintiff with Defendant’s chosen examiner is April 20, 2020, two days before the current trial date.

Plaintiff does not oppose this motion. Based upon the foregoing, the Court grants Defendant’s motion.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The Court grants Defendant’s motion for a continuance. The Court advances and vacates the final status conference and trial dates and sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: June 10, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: June 24, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be based on the new trial date. There shall be no further continuances. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: February 21, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court