Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 18:23:23 (UTC).

MAX SAEED MOHEBI, , BY AND THROUGH HIS ATTORNEY IN FACT, SHAHROUZ MOJALLALI VS WEST HILLS HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 MAX SAEED MOHEBI, , BY AND THROUGH HIS ATTORNEY IN FACT, SHAHROUZ MOJALLALI filed an Other lawsuit against WEST HILLS HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2122

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOHEBI MAX SAEED BY AND THROUGH HIS ATTORNEY IN FACT SHAHROUZ MOJALLALI

Defendant

WEST HILLS HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

DUMMIT CRAIG

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/10/2021

5/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/10/2021

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE FURTHER DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AT WEST HILLS HOSPITAL AND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORI

3/25/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE FURTHER DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE AT WEST HILLS HOSPITAL AND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORI

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT, WEST HILLS HOSPITAL, TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE;

3/25/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT, WEST HILLS HOSPITAL, TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE;

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

3/25/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT WEST HILLS HOSPITAL OPPOSITION

3/29/2021: Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT WEST HILLS HOSPITAL OPPOSITION

Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT WEST HILLS HOSPITALS OPPOSITION

3/29/2021: Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT WEST HILLS HOSPITALS OPPOSITION

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE MARK SCHWEITZER CSR 10514

3/18/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE MARK SCHWEITZER CSR 10514

Informal Discovery Conference

3/11/2021: Informal Discovery Conference

Answer

3/11/2021: Answer

Informal Discovery Conference

3/11/2021: Informal Discovery Conference

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JENNIFER TAT CSR 13773

3/15/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JENNIFER TAT CSR 13773

Separate Statement

3/16/2021: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

3/16/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

3/16/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Notice of Ruling

3/18/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

3/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • Hearing06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Hearing06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Hearing06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Hearing06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Hearing06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Hearing06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Max Saeed Mohebi, , by and through his Attorney In Fact, Shahrouz Mojallali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by West Hills Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketMotion for Trial Preference; Filed by Max Saeed Mohebi, , by and through his Attorney In Fact, Shahrouz Mojallali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Max Saeed Mohebi, , by and through his Attorney In Fact, Shahrouz Mojallali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Max Saeed Mohebi, , by and through his Attorney In Fact, Shahrouz Mojallali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Max Saeed Mohebi, , by and through his Attorney In Fact, Shahrouz Mojallali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Max Saeed Mohebi, , by and through his Attorney In Fact, Shahrouz Mojallali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Max Saeed Mohebi, , by and through his Attorney In Fact, Shahrouz Mojallali (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST HILLS HOSPITAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL