This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2023 at 22:28:29 (UTC).

MAX MARTINEZ, JR. VS DIANA FANNON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 MAX MARTINEZ, JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIANA FANNON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4551

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ MAX JR.

Defendants

FANNON DIANA

CULVER CITY A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

CULVER CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

OLSON SONALI

MAVIS MEGAN B

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/12/2022: Request for Dismissal

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

11/10/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Request for Dismissal

10/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/28/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Demand for Jury Trial

9/8/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

11/18/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer

10/22/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

10/22/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Lien

10/8/2020: Notice of Lien

Request for Dismissal

10/9/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/6/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/2/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

9/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

7/14/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MAX MARTINEZ, JR. on 06/30/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by MAX MARTINEZ, JR. as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: MAX MARTINEZ, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: DIANA FANNON (Defendant); CULVER CITY, a government entity (Defendant); Culver City Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by: MAX MARTINEZ, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: DIANA FANNON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District): Filed By: MAX MARTINEZ, JR. (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 11/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MAX MARTINEZ, JR. on 06/30/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by MAX MARTINEZ, JR. as to Culver City Unified School District

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: MAX MARTINEZ, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: DIANA FANNON (Defendant); Culver City Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: MAX MARTINEZ, JR. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MAX MARTINEZ, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: DIANA FANNON (Defendant); CULVER CITY, a government entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MAX MARTINEZ, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: DIANA FANNON (Defendant); CULVER CITY, a government entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MAX MARTINEZ, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: DIANA FANNON (Defendant); CULVER CITY, a government entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MAX MARTINEZ, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: DIANA FANNON (Defendant); CULVER CITY, a government entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less