This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 11:46:36 (UTC).

MAVEN MED, INC. VS TEXAS MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 MAVEN MED, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TEXAS MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0022

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAVEN MED INC.

Defendants

MOS REVITAL

SHAFRAN OMRI

TEXAS MEDICAL

TEXAS MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERRERA ALEJANDRO H. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

COHEN BARUCH C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

3/16/2023: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION & STAY THE WITHIN ACTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTIONS 1281.2 AND 1281.4

3/16/2023: Order - ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION & STAY THE WITHIN ACTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTIONS 1281.2 AND 1281.4

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CON...)

3/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CON...)

Notice of Ruling

3/9/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF ...)

3/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF ...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION & STAY THE WITHIN ACTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTIONS 1281.2 AND 1281.4

3/8/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION & STAY THE WITHIN ACTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTIONS 1281.2 AND 1281.4

Request for Judicial Notice

2/14/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Compel Arbitration

2/14/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF ...)

1/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR STATUS CONFERENCE RE STATUS OF ...)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • Hearing05/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions in the event Plaintiff's Counsel Fails to Compliance With the Court's Order Regarding Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Arbitration: Filed By: Texas Medical Technology (Defendant),Omri Shafran (Defendant),Texas Medical (Defendant),Texas Medical Technology (Defendant),Revital Mos (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions If Plaintiff's Counsel Fails to Compliance With the Court's Order Regarding Arbitration scheduled for 05/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION & STAY THE WITHIN ACTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTIONS 1281.2 AND 1281.4: Status Date changed from 03/16/2023 to 03/16/2023 ; Name Extension changed from ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION & STAY THE WITHIN ACTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTIONS 1281.2 AND 1281.4 to GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION & STAY THE WITHIN ACTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTIONS 1281.2 AND 1281.4 ; Result Date changed from 03/16/2023 to 03/16/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Maven Med, Inc. (Plaintiff) to Maven Med, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Binding Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Texas Medical Technology (Defendant); Texas Medical Technology (Defendant); Texas Medical (Defendant); Omri Shafran (Defendant); Revital Mos (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Con...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketOrder ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION & STAY THE WITHIN ACTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, SECTIONS 1281.2 AND 1281.4; Signed and Filed by: Texas Medical Technology (Defendant); Texas Medical Technology (Defendant); Texas Medical (Defendant); Omri Shafran (Defendant); As to: Maven Med, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maven Med, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Texas Medical Technology (Defendant); Texas Medical Technology (Defendant); Texas Medical (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maven Med, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Texas Medical Technology (Defendant); Texas Medical Technology (Defendant); Texas Medical (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maven Med, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Texas Medical Technology (Defendant); Texas Medical Technology (Defendant); Texas Medical (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara M. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Alejandro H. Herrera, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketAddress for Alejandro H. Herrera, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0022 Hearing Date: October 31, 2022 Dept: 30

Dept. 30

Calendar No.

Maven Med, Inc. vs. Texas Medical Technology, et. al., Case No. *******0022

Tentative Ruling re: Defendants’ Motion to Transfer Venue

Defendants Texas Medical Technology (a Texas LLC), Texas Medical Technology (a California business entity), Texas Medical, Omri Shafran, and Revital Mos (collectively, Defendants) move to transfer venue to Texas. The motion is denied.

On timely motion, the court must order a transfer of venue “when the court designated in the complaint is not the proper court.” (Code Civ. Proc., 396b, 397(a).) A motion to transfer venue on grounds the designated court is not proper must be filed and served before or at the time of filing an answer, demurer, or motion to strike. (Code Civ. Proc., 396b.) “Venue is determined based on the complaint on file at the time the motion to change venue is made.” (Brown v. Superior Court (1984) 37 Cal.3d 477, 482; Haurat v. Superior Court for Los Angeles County (1966) 241 Cal.App.2d 330, 337 [“Venue is determined on the basis of the complaint as it stands at the time the motion to change is made, and the plaintiff is not permitted to make a subsequent election of theories by proposed amendments thereto”].)

The general venue rule is that “the superior court in the county where the defendants or some of them reside at the commencement of the action is the proper court for the trial of the action.” (Code Civ. Proc., 395(a).) Additionally, “when a plaintiff brings an action against several defendants, both individual and corporate, in a county in which none of the defendants reside, an individual defendant has the right to change venue to the county of his or her residence.” (Fontaine v. Superior Court (2009) 175 Cal.App.4th 830, 837.) “If none of the defendants reside in the state or if they reside in the state and the county where they reside is unknown to the plaintiff, the action may be tried in the superior court in any county that the plaintiff may designate in his or her complaint, and, if the defendant is about to depart from the state, the action may be tried in the superior court in any county where either of the parties reside or service is made.” (Code Civ. Proc. 395, subd. (a).)

As an initial matter, Defendants’ notice of motion is deficient: “The notice of motion should specify the county or judicial district to which the transfer is sought, and a notice of motion to change the venue to one county will not support a motion for change to a different county.” (61 Cal. Jur. 3d Venue 88 [citing Heidel v. California Transit Co. (1928) 204 Cal. 21].) Defendants’ Notice only states that transfer is being sought to “Texas.”

In addition to the deficient notice, Defendants’ motion to transfer venue to Texas must be denied because a motion to transfer venue operates to transfer an action to a different county within California, not out of state. Under Code Civ. Proc. 395, subd. (a), a proper court is generally “the superior court in the county where the defendants or some of them reside” (emphasis added). “The term ‘venue’ denotes the particular county within the state where a case is to be heard.” (California State Parks Foundation v. Superior Court (2007) 150 Cal.App.4th 826, 833.) This Court lacks authority under the venue statutes (Code Civ. Proc. 392, et seq.) to transfer venue to an unspecified court in Texas.

Defendants’ request to have this action heard in a forum outside California must be made pursuant to Code Civ. Proc. 410.30, supported by a showing that dismissal in favor of Texas would be “in the interest of substantial justice”: “When a court upon motion of a party or its own motion finds that in the interest of substantial justice an action should be heard in a forum outside this state, the court shall stay or dismiss the action in whole or in part on any conditions that may be just.” (Code Civ. Proc. 410.30, subd. (a).)