This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 18:27:08 (UTC).

MAURINA MARILU CINTRON, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 MAURINA MARILU CINTRON, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0736

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAREAGA JINESSA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GAL MAURINA MARILU CINTRON

CINTRON AN INDIVIDUAL MAURINA MARILU

GARDEA ATHENNA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GAL MAURINA MARILU CINTRON

Defendants

CITY OF BELLFLOWER

CRH CALIFORNIA WATER INC.

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

KIM AN INDIVIDUAL MYUNG SOO

LOS ANGELES COUNTY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EISON OWILI K. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

9/9/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2024
  • Hearing08/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Hearing02/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Hearing02/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maurina Marilu Cintron, an individual (Plaintiff); Athenna Gardea,, a minor, by and through her GAL, Maurina Marilu Cintron (Plaintiff); Jinessa Careaga, a minor, by and through her GAL, Maurina Marilu Cintron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maurina Marilu Cintron, an individual (Plaintiff); Athenna Gardea,, a minor, by and through her GAL, Maurina Marilu Cintron (Plaintiff); Jinessa Careaga, a minor, by and through her GAL, Maurina Marilu Cintron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRH California Water Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF BELLFLOWER is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant