Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 11:49:17 (UTC).

MAURICIO PORTILLO VS STEVEN DENNIS POLL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 MAURICIO PORTILLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STEVEN DENNIS POLL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9817

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTILLO MAURICIO

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MARY QUAN

MARTIN QUAN A.

POLL STEVEN DENNIS

Defendant and Cross Defendant

POLL STEVEN DENNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHIRINYAN EDITA

MARTINIAN TIGRAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MILLER RICHARD T.

RIVERA ADAM

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

4/20/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

General Denial

4/14/2021: General Denial

General Denial

4/5/2021: General Denial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/1/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/12/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2024
  • Hearing03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Hearing09/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Hearing08/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Martin A. Quan Erroneously Sued As Quan A. Martin (Defendant); Mary Quan Erroneously Sued As Quan Mary (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by Martin A. Quan Erroneously Sued As Quan A. Martin (Defendant); Mary Quan Erroneously Sued As Quan Mary (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by Martin A. Quan Erroneously Sued As Quan A. Martin (Defendant); Mary Quan Erroneously Sued As Quan Mary (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Martin A. Quan Erroneously Sued As Quan A. Martin (Defendant); Mary Quan Erroneously Sued As Quan Mary (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by Steven Dennis Poll (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mauricio Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mauricio Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mauricio Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mauricio Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mauricio Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mauricio Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIRINYAN EDITA