This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2021 at 21:53:02 (UTC).

MAURICIO ERNESTO CORDOVA, ET AL. VS ROBERT LOUIS POWER

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 MAURICIO ERNESTO CORDOVA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERT LOUIS POWER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1666

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORDOVA MAURICIO ERNESTO

CORDOVA GABRIEL MAURICIO

Defendant

POWER ROBERT LOUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECK MITCHELL

Defendant Attorneys

MCGARRY JAMES

MCGARRY JAMES J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/9/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/19/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

6/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/2/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/2/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/2/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Substitution of Attorney

1/26/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mauricio Ernesto Cordova (Plaintiff); Gabriel Mauricio Cordova (Plaintiff); Robert Louis Power (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Robert Louis Power (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Robert Louis Power (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Robert Louis Power (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Robert Louis Power (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mauricio Ernesto Cordova (Plaintiff); Gabriel Mauricio Cordova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mauricio Ernesto Cordova (Plaintiff); Gabriel Mauricio Cordova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mauricio Ernesto Cordova (Plaintiff); Gabriel Mauricio Cordova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mauricio Ernesto Cordova (Plaintiff); Gabriel Mauricio Cordova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGARRY JAMES J. ESQ