This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2022 at 08:17:32 (UTC).

MAURICE ADAMS VS SABINE OBAJI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 MAURICE ADAMS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SABINE OBAJI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3264

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMS MAURICE

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

ANTONUCCI JAMES

OBAJI SABINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FARZAM JOSEPH S

GREEN MICHAEL P

Defendant Attorney

GALES ALISSA J

Cross Defendant Attorney

GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/23/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

PI General Order

10/8/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

10/15/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/15/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

11/12/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/12/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

11/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

11/18/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

12/9/2021: Answer

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

1/11/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

1/11/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

1/11/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2024
  • Hearing09/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • Hearing03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • Hearing02/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Sadine Obaji Erroneously Sued As SABINE OBAJI (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by MAURICE ADAMS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion (FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR SANCTIONS;); Filed by Sadine Obaji Erroneously Sued As SABINE OBAJI (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion (FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR SANCTION); Filed by Sadine Obaji Erroneously Sued As SABINE OBAJI (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion (FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND FOR SANCTIONS;); Filed by Sadine Obaji Erroneously Sued As SABINE OBAJI (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sadine Obaji Erroneously Sued As SABINE OBAJI (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by JAMES ANTONUCCI (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by Sadine Obaji Erroneously Sued As SABINE OBAJI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Sadine Obaji Erroneously Sued As SABINE OBAJI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sadine Obaji Erroneously Sued As SABINE OBAJI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MAURICE ADAMS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MAURICE ADAMS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MAURICE ADAMS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MAURICE ADAMS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALES ALISSA J