This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2018 at 13:07:55 (UTC).

MAUREEN BERNSTEIN VS R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 MAUREEN BERNSTEIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against R F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARC D. GROSS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1997

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BERNSTEIN MAUREEN

Defendants and Respondents

R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES INC.

BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROGNLIEN CARRIE J. ESQ

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HUGHES BRADFORD G. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES, INC. DBA BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MAUREEN BERNSTEIN'S COMPLAINT

9/22/2017: DEFENDANT R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES, INC. DBA BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MAUREEN BERNSTEIN'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/6/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CoverSheet

8/23/2017: CoverSheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/23/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

8/23/2017: Summons

Complaint

8/23/2017: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Maureen Bernstein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Maureen Bernstein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • at 10:30 AM in Department 3; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (Informal Discovery Conference-PI; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-19 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DEFENDANT R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES, INC. DBA BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MAUREEN BERNSTEIN'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Answer; Filed by R & F Rolapp Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant); Beverly Hills Transfer & Storage (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maureen Bernstein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Maureen Bernstein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Maureen Bernstein (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE is a litigant

Latest cases where R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES INC. A CORPORATION DBA BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROGNLIEN CARRIE