This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2020 at 04:44:57 (UTC).

MATTIA BESOZZI DI CASTELBESOZZO VS JAMMIT, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 MATTIA BESOZZI DI CASTELBESOZZO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAMMIT, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0643

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BESOZZI DI CASTELBESOZZO MATTIA

DI CASTELBESOZZO MATTIE BESOZZI

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JAMMIT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

JAMMIT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

STAUB DAVID JOSHUA

STAUB D. JOSHUA

STAUB DAVID J

STAUB DAVID J ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

NAQVI KAZIM A.

NAQVI KAZIM A. ESQ.

HARFORD DAVID

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

6/18/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 06/19/2020

6/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 06/19/2020

Request for Dismissal

6/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/05/2020

5/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/05/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: MOTION SETTING)]

4/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: MOTION SETTING)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE)

4/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE)

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

3/17/2020: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE)

3/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 03/20/2020

3/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 03/20/2020

Notice - NOTICE SECOND NOTICE OF TRIAL AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DATES

2/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE SECOND NOTICE OF TRIAL AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DATES

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/25/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DOCUMENT DEMAND, SET ONE

2/18/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DOCUMENT DEMAND, SET ONE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/18/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

2/6/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice - NOTICE TRIAL DATE

1/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE TRIAL DATE

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF ANSWER

12/31/2019: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF ANSWER

Proof of Service by Mail

9/24/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/29/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mattie Besozzi di Castelbesozzo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Mattie Besozzi di Castelbesozzo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Call with Judicial Officer); Filed by Mattie Besozzi di Castelbesozzo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice (CORRECTED notice of conference call with judicial officer); Filed by Mattie Besozzi di Castelbesozzo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 06/19/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Mattie Besozzi di Castelbesozzo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Mattie Besozzi di Castelbesozzo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice (Regarding Motion to Compel Cooley's Compliance with Subpoena); Filed by Mattie Besozzi di Castelbesozzo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Jammit, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jammit, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Jammit, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Mattie Besozzi di Castelbesozzo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mattie Besozzi di Castelbesozzo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mattie Besozzi di Castelbesozzo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mattie Besozzi di Castelbesozzo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mattie Besozzi di Castelbesozzo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAQVI KAZIM A.