This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 21:46:11 (UTC).

MATTHEW VIDALES VS CITY OF LOS ANGELS ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2017 MATTHEW VIDALES filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL E. WHITAKER and FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9140

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIDALES MATTHEW

Defendants

SOTOMAYO RODOLFO

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

SOUTH PASADENA CITY OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METRO TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KOTTLER DOUGLAS EVAN

YOKA NICHOLAS W.

Defendant Attorneys

GALLAGHER THOMAS FRANCIS

LEVY NAZILA Y.

WEISBERG DAVID

D'ORO FRANK J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

12/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

11/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/15/2021

11/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/15/2021

Notice of Settlement

11/15/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

11/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Substitution of Attorney

8/19/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Order - Dismissal

5/20/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

5/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL (CCP 473))

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL (CCP 473))

Proof of Service by Mail

4/15/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

3/26/2021: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

11/3/2020: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL F...)

10/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL F...)

Order - Dismissal

10/30/2020: Order - Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION NON-APPEARANCE AT 07/06/2020 CMC HEARING

10/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION NON-APPEARANCE AT 07/06/2020 CMC HEARING

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING RE: DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AND TSC

7/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING RE: DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AND TSC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MATTHEW VIDALES on 02/01/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Matthew Vidales as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 02/17/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Filed by: Matthew Vidales (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles, City of (Defendant); Los Angeles, County of (Defendant); Los Angeles County Metro Transportation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Matthew Vidales (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: notice of settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: notice of settlement) of 11/15/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
127 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 02/03/20 at 8:30 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 12/11/18 at 8:30 am Elaine Lu

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 11/27/18 at 10:00 am Elaine Lu

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9140    Hearing Date: April 15, 2021    Dept: 32

PLEASE NOTE: Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept32@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear in-person or remotely.

TENTATIVE RULING

DEPARTMENT

32

HEARING DATE

April 15, 2021

CASE NUMBER

****9140

MOTION

Motion to Set Aside Dismissal

MOVING PARTY

Plaintiff Matthew Vidales

OPPOSING PARTY

None

MOTION

Plaintiff Matthew Vidales (“Plaintiff”) moves to set aside the Court’s order of October 30, 2020, in which the Court dismissed Plaintiff’s complaint for failure to appear at the trial setting conference. Defendant City of Los Angeles has not filed an opposition to the motion.

ANALYSIS

Per Code of Civil Procedure section 473, subdivision (b), a court may “relieve a party or his or her legal representative from a judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding taken against him or her through his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect.” In addition, a court must vacate a default or dismissal when a motion for relief under Section 473, subdivision (b) is filed timely and accompanied by an attorney’s sworn affidavit attesting to the attorney’s mistake, inadvertence, surprise or neglect “unless the court finds that the default or dismissal was not in fact caused by the attorney’s mistake, inadvertence, surprise or neglect.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 473, subd. (b).) The party must seek such relief “within a reasonable time, in no case exceeding six months, after the judgment, dismissal, order, or proceeding was taken.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 473, subd. (b).)

Plaintiff advances the declaration of his counsel, Sergio J. Puche (“Counsel”). Counsel states that he failed to appear for the trial setting conference because he could not register for Court Connect in time to attend the hearing. (See Declaration of Sergio J. Puche.) The Court therefore concludes that its dismissal of Plaintiff’s complaint was the result of Counsel’s mistake.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Accordingly, the Court grants Plaintiff’s motion for relief, and sets aside the October 30, 2020 order of dismissal. The Court also sets a Trial Setting Conference on May 20, 2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 32.

Plaintiff is to give notice of this order to all parties, and file a proof of service of such.