This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2023 at 11:36:32 (UTC).

MATTHEW STANTON VS INTERNATIONAL MERCHANDISING COMPANY, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 MATTHEW STANTON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against INTERNATIONAL MERCHANDISING COMPANY, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK, STUART M. RICE and LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3366

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

STUART M. RICE

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANTON MATTHEW

Defendants

INTERNATIONAL MERCHANDISING COMPANY LLC

WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT LLC

ONE SIXTY OVER NINETY CA LLC DBA 160OVER90

ENDEAVOR OPERATING COMPANY LLC

DOES 1-25

MIKE LEWINSKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EGHBALI BENJAMIN

CHANG MICHAEL HYUNJOON

GABRIEL GAVRIL THEODOROS

Defendant Attorneys

GILBERT ALEXANDRIA M.

SIEVE CAROLYN ENCISO

 

Court Documents

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/4/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Status Report - STATUS REPORT REGARDING ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS

3/27/2023: Status Report - STATUS REPORT REGARDING ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/21/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF WITNESS ANDREW SAUNDERS

2/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF WITNESS ANDREW SAUNDERS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

1/13/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

10/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

10/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Request for Refund / Order

4/8/2021: Request for Refund / Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY COURT ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

3/19/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY COURT ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2021

3/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

1/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE

1/6/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (C/F 11/18/20); HEARING ON EX PART...)

1/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (C/F 11/18/20); HEARING ON EX PART...)

Notice of Ruling

1/11/2021: Notice of Ruling

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2023
  • Hearing12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Post-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 49 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/14/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketAddress for Michael Hyunjoon Chang (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketAddress for Benjamin Eghbali (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketStatus Report REGARDING ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS; Filed by: International Merchandising Company, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketAddress for Carolyn Enciso Sieve (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketAddress for Alexandria M. Gilbert (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Matthew Stanton (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Laura A. Seigle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: Matthew Stanton (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/24/2020; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 48 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Matthew Stanton (Plaintiff); As to: INTERNATIONAL MERCHANDISING COMPANY, LLC (Defendant); ONE SIXTY OVER NINETY CA, LLC (Defendant); WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Matthew Stanton (Plaintiff); As to: INTERNATIONAL MERCHANDISING COMPANY, LLC (Defendant); ONE SIXTY OVER NINETY CA, LLC (Defendant); WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Matthew Stanton (Plaintiff); As to: INTERNATIONAL MERCHANDISING COMPANY, LLC (Defendant); ONE SIXTY OVER NINETY CA, LLC (Defendant); WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less