This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2022 at 00:30:38 (UTC).

MATTHEW STANTON VS INTERNATIONAL MERCHANDISING COMPANY, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 MATTHEW STANTON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against INTERNATIONAL MERCHANDISING COMPANY, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK and LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3366

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANTON MATTHEW

Defendants

INTERNATIONAL MERCHANDISING COMPANY LLC

WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT LLC

ONE SIXTY OVER NINETY CA LLC DBA 160OVER90

ENDEAVOR OPERATING COMPANY LLC

DOES 1-25

MIKE LEWINSKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHANG MICHAEL HYUNJOON

GABRIEL GAVRIL THEODOROS

EGHBALI BENJAMIN

Defendant Attorneys

SIEVE CAROLYN ENCISO

GILBERT ALEXANDRIA M.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

1/13/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

10/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

10/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Request for Refund / Order

4/8/2021: Request for Refund / Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY COURT ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

3/19/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY COURT ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2021

3/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

1/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE

1/6/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (C/F 11/18/20); HEARING ON EX PART...)

1/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (C/F 11/18/20); HEARING ON EX PART...)

Notice of Ruling

1/11/2021: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

12/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

12/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/6/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

10/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

Case Management Statement

10/19/2020: Case Management Statement

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • Hearing04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by International Merchandising Company, LLC (Defendant); One Sixty Over Ninety CA, LLC (Defendant); Endeavor Operating Company, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Matthew Stanton (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Association of Counsel); Filed by Matthew Stanton (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 49, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Matthew Stanton (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 49, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docketat 4:41 PM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Matthew Stanton (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge, C.C.P. 170.6;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge, C.C.P. 170.6;) of 06/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Matthew Stanton (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Matthew Stanton (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Matthew Stanton (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENDEAVOR OPERATING COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERNATIONAL MERCHANDISING COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIEVE CAROLYN