This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 02:21:53 (UTC).

MATTHEW SHADSIRAT ET AL VS CARLITOS WAY INCE ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/03/2018 MATTHEW SHADSIRAT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CARLITOS WAY INCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0513

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SHADSIRAT MATTHEW

GOMEZ-RIVAS MIRNA AS DECEDENTS JULIO

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

CASTELLANOS CARLOS ARMANDO

CARLITOS WAY INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

SAB INVESTMENT HOLDINGS LLC DOE 1

CALIFORNIA METRO PATROL & EMS LLC DOE2

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

SAB INVESTMENT HOLDINGS LLC DOE 1

Minor

GOMEZ-RODRIGUEZ NATHAN

Guardian Ad Litem

GOMEZ-RIVAS MIRNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorney

HABBAS SAMER SAMI

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

POSNER ASHLEY E. ESQ.

ANDERSEN SUSAN

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KATOFSKY JEFF

 

Court Documents

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/26/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/6/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/28/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

7/25/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT CARLITOS WAY INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; PROPOSED ORDER

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT CARLITOS WAY INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; PROPOSED ORDER

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT CARLITOS WAY INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE; PROPOSED ORDER

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT CARLITOS WAY INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET ONE; PROPOSED ORDER

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

10/12/2018: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order

12/13/2018: Minute Order

Answer

1/3/2019: Answer

CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

7/18/2018: CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

DEFENDANT SAB INVESTMENT HOLDINGS, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/18/2018: DEFENDANT SAB INVESTMENT HOLDINGS, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/1/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/25/2018: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

5/18/2018: SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER F0R APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

4/30/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER F0R APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

4/16/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

4/3/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by SAB Investment Holdings, LLC (Doe 1) (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Matthew Shadsirat (Plaintiff); Nathan Gomez-Rodriguez (Legacy Party); Mirna as decedents Julio Gomez-Rivas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by SAB Investment Holdings, LLC (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Answer; Filed by California Metro Patrol & EMS, LLC (Doe2) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Plaintiffs Special Interrogatories, Set One) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Pl...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • at 2:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2018
  • ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Matthew Shadsirat (Plaintiff); Nathan Gomez-Rodriguez (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER F0R APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Matthew Shadsirat (Plaintiff); Mirna as decedents Julio Gomez-Rivas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC700513    Hearing Date: December 24, 2019    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the Northwest District, Van Nuys, JUDGE H. COTTON presiding in Department A for further assignment to an Independent Calendar Court. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.