This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2022 at 16:02:52 (UTC).

MATTHEW PORPORA VS HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 MATTHEW PORPORA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON, TERESA A. BEAUDET and ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7361

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

TERESA A. BEAUDET

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORPORA MATTHEW

Defendants

CALIFORNIA MENTOR FAMILY HOME AGENCY LLC DBA CALIFORNIA MENTOR

MENTOR MANAGEMENT INC.

MENTOR BUSINESS NETWORK GROUP

THE MENTOR NETWORK CHARITABLE FOUNDATION INC.

HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES INC. DBA COLE VOCATIONAL SERVICES CO.

NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FLYNN FRANCIS XAVIER

DENIS DAVID ROBERT

Defendant Attorneys

HINTZE CRISTEN REBEKAH

SCHAWN BRADLEY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

6/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

6/8/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES AMENDED

6/16/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES AMENDED

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT AMENDED

6/16/2022: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT AMENDED

Objection - OBJECTION JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/15/2022: Objection - OBJECTION JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE ...)

6/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

6/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR IME

6/9/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR IME

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

6/9/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/9/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS APPLICATION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAM OF PLAINTIFF, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SHORTEN TIME

6/9/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS APPLICATION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAM OF PLAINTIFF, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SHORTEN TIME

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

6/9/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

6/9/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL ASSOCIATED DEADLINES

6/9/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL ASSOCIATED DEADLINES

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAM OF PLAINTIFF, AND FOR SANCTIONS

6/9/2022: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAM OF PLAINTIFF, AND FOR SANCTIONS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRADLEY SCHWAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAM OF PLAINTIFF

6/9/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRADLEY SCHWAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAM OF PLAINTIFF

Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

6/2/2022: Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS SUBMITTED IN SUPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

6/2/2022: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS SUBMITTED IN SUPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • Hearing07/20/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Hearing07/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Hearing07/01/2022 at 4:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department STL-E at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; MSC Timeslot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50; Hearing - Other (Hearing on Objections) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Hearing - Other (Hearing on Objections)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketOrder re: defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudictaion of Issues.; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities (Amended); Filed by Matthew Porpora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Horrigan Cole Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Matthew Porpora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Matthew Porpora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Matthew Porpora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Matthew Porpora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Matthew Porpora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Matthew Porpora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******7361 Hearing Date: June 7, 2022 Dept: 50

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

MATTHEW PORPORA,

Plaintiff,

vs.

HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES, INC., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

*******7361

Hearing Date:

June 7, 2022

Hearing Time:

8:30 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

The motion for summary judgment, or in the alternative, summary adjudication of issues brought by Defendant Horrigan Cole Enterprises, Inc. dba Cole Vocational Services, Co. (“Defendant”) is continued as set forth below.

The parties have interposed more than 75 evidentiary objections. Due to the voluminous number of objections, the hearing on the motion will be continued to a date that will be set at the Hearing on Objections discussed below.

The Court orders the parties to meet and confer by telephone or in person in a serious and good faith effort to resolve and eliminate the objections. The only objections that should remain are those that pertain to material evidence regarding material issues. Keeping the rules of evidence in mind, the parties should be able to reduce the objections to just a few. If any material objections remain unresolved, the parties are to set them forth in a joint statement with the text, the objection, and the argument of each side in favor of their respective positions regarding the remaining material objections, along with a space for a ruling.

The joint statement must be filed on or before with a courtesy copy delivered to Department 50. The Court will review any remaining objections with the parties at a hearing on at 2:00 p.m. (the “Hearing on Objections”). The date for the hearing on the motion will be set at the Hearing on Objections.

If necessary, based upon the resolutions reached during the meet and confer process and/or at the Hearing on Objections, the parties may respectively file and serve revised briefing and evidence. The revised evidence may eliminate objectionable material; however, no new evidence or new argument is to be submitted unless it is as a result of compromises reached during the meet and confer process. In the event that revised briefing and evidence is necessary, the Court will discuss with the parties a briefing schedule for the revised briefing at the Hearing on Objections.

Defendant is ordered to give notice of this Order.

DATED: June 7, 2022

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE MENTOR NETWORK CHARITABLE FOUNDATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mentor Management, Inc. is a litigant