This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 11:00:30 (UTC).

MATTHEW PEAK VS SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 MATTHEW PEAK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERRY GREEN and JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4062

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERRY GREEN

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEAK MATTHEW AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

BANK OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PURCELL BYRON

NAVARRO JULIO C.

Defendant Attorneys

IDLEMAN WILLIAM

STRATTON SARA ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/16/2021

9/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/16/2021

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JOANNA BROADWELL CSR#10959

8/3/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JOANNA BROADWELL CSR#10959

Other - - COURT ORDER FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION HEARING SET FOR 2/26/21

3/3/2021: Other - - COURT ORDER FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION HEARING SET FOR 2/26/21

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/19/2021: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PAVEL EKMEKCHYAN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

2/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PAVEL EKMEKCHYAN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

2/19/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Response - RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/16/2021: Response - RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/16/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Motion for Summary Judgment

12/11/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

10/13/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO THE FIRST A...)

7/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO THE FIRST A...)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

5/13/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Request for Judicial Notice

5/13/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

2/21/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/6/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

1/29/2020: Request - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

12/11/2019: Proof of Personal Service

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketJudgment (Proposed); Filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCourt Order for Motion for Summary Judgment hearing held 8/2/21; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Joanna Broadwell CSR#10959)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketRequest (for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Demurrer to Complaint); Filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of William Idleman in Support of Defs Demurrer to Complaint); Filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Matthew Peak, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (OF WILLIAM IDLEMAN UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41(a)(2)); Filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Matthew Peak, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Matthew Peak, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Matthew Peak, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Matthew Peak, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAVARRO JULIO C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PURCELL BYRON MICHAEL