Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2020 at 07:39:23 (UTC).

MATTHEW MATIN VS REZA AFZALI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 MATTHEW MATIN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against REZA AFZALI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1134

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATIN MATTHEW

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

STARCREST ESCROW INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AFZALI REZA

SECTORES PROPERTY GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Defendant

SECTORES PROPERTY GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALKANA EUGENE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MAGUIRE SHANE

LISNOW ROBERT

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

LISNOW ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/2/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER;) OF 05/28/2020

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER;) OF 05/28/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER;) OF 04/14/2020

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER;) OF 04/14/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)

5/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)

Notice - NOTICE MOTION TO STRIKE

5/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE MOTION TO STRIKE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER;) OF 05/01/2020

5/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER;) OF 05/01/2020

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

5/1/2020: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Answer

5/6/2020: Answer

Notice of Settlement

5/11/2020: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/11/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/11/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Proof of Personal Service

1/31/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/10/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/19/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/19/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/19/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Matthew Matin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (.) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order;) of 05/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Matthew Matin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause Hearing); Filed by Matthew Matin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Matthew Matin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Matthew Matin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Matthew Matin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Matthew Matin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Matthew Matin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Matthew Matin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less