This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 08:59:44 (UTC).

MATTHEW LUCIANO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ACADEMY LA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 MATTHEW LUCIANO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ACADEMY LA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8181

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUCIANO AN INDIVIDUAL MATTHEW

Defendants

6021 HOLLYWOOD OPERATING COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;

ACADEMY LA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;

DAVIDOO AN INDIVIDUAL; ALLEN

INSOMNIAC HOLDINGS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAVIPUDI RAHUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

11/3/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2024
  • Hearing10/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • Hearing04/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MATTHEW LUCIANO, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MATTHEW LUCIANO, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MATTHEW LUCIANO, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MATTHEW LUCIANO, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MATTHEW LUCIANO, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MATTHEW LUCIANO, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MATTHEW LUCIANO, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MATTHEW LUCIANO, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSOMNIAC HOLDINGS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAVIPUDI RAHUL