This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2022 at 18:13:21 (UTC).

MATTHEW KATZ VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 MATTHEW KATZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0800

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KATZ MATTHEW

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

INGERSON GREGORY MOORE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/2/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/2/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/1/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Matthew Katz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Matthew Katz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Matthew Katz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Matthew Katz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer INGERSON GREGORY M.