This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 11:17:14 (UTC).

MATTHEW HOGAN VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 MATTHEW HOGAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL C. KELLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0712

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOGAN MATTHEW

Defendants

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

SUNLAND FORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA GRACE

Defendant Attorney

MORTENSON MICHAEL DONN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/16/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

11/4/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/5/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2024
  • Hearing01/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2024
  • Hearing01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 01/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 updated: Result Date to 01/11/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Matthew Hogan (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Sunland Ford (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Matthew Hogan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Matthew Hogan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Sunland Ford (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Sunland Ford (Defendant); As to: Matthew Hogan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department A15 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Matthew Hogan (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Sunland Ford (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Matthew Hogan (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Sunland Ford (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Matthew Hogan (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Sunland Ford (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLIN TIONNA