This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2020 at 07:18:16 (UTC).

MATTHEW B.F. BIREN VS KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 MATTHEW B F BIREN filed an Other lawsuit against KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5812

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIREN MATTHEW B.F.

Defendants

KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS

SANTANA MARIBEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BIREN MATTHEW B.F.

BIREN ANDREW G.

Defendant Attorneys

WERNER JOSEPH A. ESQ.

HAGAN CHRISTOPHER J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Outgoing Transfer

6/17/2020: Notice of Outgoing Transfer

Receipt for Transmitted Record

6/17/2020: Receipt for Transmitted Record

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

6/5/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION JOHN A. ROBERTS, ESQ. DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE DIMISSAL

6/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION JOHN A. ROBERTS, ESQ. DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE DIMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/28/2020

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/28/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

3/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE

3/10/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2020

3/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2020

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/30/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/7/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT INTERPLEAD FUNDS

1/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT INTERPLEAD FUNDS

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/18/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/18/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/18/2019: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • Hearing07/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketReceipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (John A. Roberts, Esq. Declaration in Response to OSC Re Dimissal); Filed by Matthew B.F. Biren (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order); Filed by Matthew B.F. Biren (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF COURT ORDER); Filed by Matthew B.F. Biren (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/10/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Matthew B.F. Biren (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF DEPOSIT INTERPLEAD FUNDS); Filed by Matthew B.F. Biren (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Matthew B.F. Biren (Plaintiff); Matthew B.F. Biren (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Matthew B.F. Biren (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Matthew B.F. Biren (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Matthew B.F. Biren (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIREN ANDREW G.O.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIREN MATTHEW B.F.