This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 07:35:05 (UTC).

MATTEO ACCETTA VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 MATTEO ACCETTA filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE F. BIRD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0360

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGE F. BIRD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCETTA MATTEO

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WHELAN TIMOTHY M.

ROMANO MARK

VALITSKAYA ALIAKSANDRA

Defendant Attorney

INGOLD TREVOR J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/10/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/10/2022: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

12/20/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/11/2023

1/11/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/11/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/30/2023

1/30/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/30/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2023
  • Hearing04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order: Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order: Case Management Conference) of 01/30/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 04/18/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order: Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order: Case Management Conference) of 01/11/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 04/10/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Matteo Accetta (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Matteo Accetta (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Matteo Accetta (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/13/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. George F. Bird in Department B Compton Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Matteo Accetta (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Matteo Accetta (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Matteo Accetta (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less