Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2020 at 10:30:21 (UTC).

MATT JACOBSON VS MERCEDES MOTORING, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 MATT JACOBSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MERCEDES MOTORING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1325

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACOBSON MATT

Defendants

FRANCIS JIMMY F.

MERCEDES MOTORING

FRANCIS JIMMY F. DBA MERCEDES MOTORING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

ZUCKERMAN PAUL

ZUCKERMAN PAUL STUART

MCMAHON BRIAN

MCMAHON BRIAN D

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/5/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Substitution of Attorney

1/27/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

1/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Answer

11/20/2019: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

11/20/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/21/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

11/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/16/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/16/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/16/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/16/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/18/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/18/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Matt Jacobson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Jimmy F. Francis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mercedes Motoring (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jimmy F. Francis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jimmy F. Francis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Matt Jacobson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Matt Jacobson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Matt Jacobson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Matt Jacobson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Matt Jacobson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCMAHON BRIAN D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCMAHON BRIAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.