This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2022 at 15:31:01 (UTC).

MATSUNAGA, KEIKO H. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 MATSUNAGA, KEIKO H - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAY, GUS T. and PRIVER, MARK S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5736

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAY, GUS T.

PRIVER, MARK S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PENA PATRICIA K.

Decedents and Not Classified By Court

MATSUNAGA KEIKO H.

SETTLE KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

LEHN RICHARD ANTON

 

Court Documents

Will - Admitted

8/12/2021: Will - Admitted

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

8/25/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

8/26/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

9/1/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

9/17/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

Letters (Initial)

10/18/2021: Letters (Initial)

Notice - Administration to Creditors

12/7/2021: Notice - Administration to Creditors

Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal

3/2/2022: Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal

Account - Final or Waiver - First and Final Account

3/2/2022: Account - Final or Waiver - First and Final Account

Notice - Hearing

3/22/2022: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Hearing

8/3/2021: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

8/12/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/13/2021: Minute Order

Supplement

7/6/2021: Supplement

Will in Safekeeping - 5 pgs - Dated - 03/13/2003 - 21STSK00652

3/24/2021: Will in Safekeeping - 5 pgs - Dated - 03/13/2003 - 21STSK00652

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

7/1/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

6/28/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

6/10/2021: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • Hearing12/12/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Accounting Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAccount - Final or Waiver (First and Final Account ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal (Inventory and Appraisal )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice - Administration to Creditors; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSupplement; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketWill in Safekeeping (5 pgs - Dated - 03/13/2003 - 21STSK00652 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHN RICHARD ANTON