This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 02:43:00 (UTC).

MATHONI, ANITA VS KARIMI, ARDESHIR

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 MATHONI, ANITA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KARIMI, ARDESHIR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4082

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MATHONI ANITA

Respondent

KARIMI ARDESHIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROSENBERG CHARLES

Respondent Attorney

GREEN CHARLES M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Mail - - Response to Form Interrogatories-Family Law, Set One; Response to Demand for Production of Documents, Set One; Response to Special Interrogatories; Set One; Verification; F

1/15/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - - Response to Form Interrogatories-Family Law, Set One; Response to Demand for Production of Documents, Set One; Response to Special Interrogatories; Set One; Verification; F

Proof of Service - Mail - Re: Decl of Discl, etc.

11/3/2020: Proof of Service - Mail - Re: Decl of Discl, etc.

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

11/3/2020: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service of Summons - Petition - FL100; Family Law Case Cover Sheet and Certificate Court Order to Share Financial Information for Divorce, legal Separateion, or Nullity Cases

8/25/2020: Proof of Service of Summons - Petition - FL100; Family Law Case Cover Sheet and Certificate Court Order to Share Financial Information for Divorce, legal Separateion, or Nullity Cases

Proof of Service - Declaration of Disclosure; I &E

8/25/2020: Proof of Service - Declaration of Disclosure; I &E

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

8/25/2020: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service - Mail - Response to Dissolution

7/6/2020: Proof of Service - Mail - Response to Dissolution

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/8/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

7/8/2020: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

5/11/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/11/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

5/11/2020: Summons

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

5/12/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

5/12/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (- Response to Form Interrogatories-Family Law, Set One; Response to Demand for Production of Documents, Set One; Response to Special Interrogatories; Set One; Verification; Flash Drive W/ Documents ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Re: Decl of Discl, etc. ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Petition - FL100; Family Law Case Cover Sheet and Certificate Court Order to Share Financial Information for Divorce, legal Separateion, or Nullity Cases ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Declaration of Disclosure; I &E ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Response to Dissolution ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF CHARLES ROSENBERG