This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2023 at 03:26:50 (UTC).

MATEO RODRIGUEZ VS CATALINA PAYAN HERNANDEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 MATEO RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CATALINA PAYAN HERNANDEZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2876

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ MATEO

Defendants

DRIVER DOE

HERNANDEZ CATALINA PAYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARIMIAN SHAHIN SHAWN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/6/2022: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/6/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

10/6/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

10/6/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2024
  • Hearing10/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2024
  • Hearing04/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2024
  • Hearing03/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mateo Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Catalina Payan Hernandez (Defendant); Doe Driver (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mateo Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Catalina Payan Hernandez (Defendant); Doe Driver (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mateo Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Catalina Payan Hernandez (Defendant); Doe Driver (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARIMIAN SHAHIN