This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2020 at 00:14:42 (UTC).

MASHIAN LAW GROUP VS ROD KAGAN

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 MASHIAN LAW GROUP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROD KAGAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GERALD ROSENBERG and MARC D. GROSS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9493

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GERALD ROSENBERG

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MASHIAN LAW GROUP

Defendant

KAGAN ROD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASHIAN BRYAN

Defendant Attorney

IGHANI HOOMAN BRUCE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ...)

2/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ...)

Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGEMENT

3/4/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGEMENT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

3/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

10/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/16/2019

10/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/16/2019

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS

9/5/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIMEOF M...)

9/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIMEOF M...)

Notice of Ruling

8/27/2019: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR AWARD OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JONATHAN RAFAE

8/30/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR AWARD OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JONATHAN RAFAE

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

9/4/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/19/2019

8/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/19/2019

Motion for Attorney Fees

6/28/2019: Motion for Attorney Fees

Request for Dismissal

5/7/2019: Request for Dismissal

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

5/15/2019: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Proof of Service by Mail

5/15/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/22/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

4/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Judgment); Filed by MASHIAN LAW GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketJudgment ([PROPOSED] JUDGEMENT); Filed by MASHIAN LAW GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Order to Show Cause Re: ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 10/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order Shortening Timeof Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MASHIAN LAW GROUP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MASHIAN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL LEGAL CORPORATION is a litigant