Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2021 at 04:11:15 (UTC).

MARYEM GHARANI, ET AL. VS FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 MARYEM GHARANI filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0005

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GHARANI MARYEM

RAHIM-KHOSHAVAZ AMIRABBAS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP INC.

STERN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

INFINITY REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT V. LLC DOE 1

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE

SOLEX CONSTRUCTION INC.

WATERPROOFING EXPERTS INC.

YOUSEFIAN SAEED

Defendants and Cross Defendants

WATERPROOFING EXPERTS INC.

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALES SASSOON

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MASON HEATHER MICHELLE

SAFARIAN AROUTUN HARRY

DECAMP CAMILLE JOY

ORLAND JAMES

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ORLAND JAMES

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement

3/10/2021: Separate Statement

Order - ORDER RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/10/2021: Order - ORDER RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/31/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Refund / Order

5/6/2020: Request for Refund / Order

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/13/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA VEAL IN SUPPORT

12/31/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA VEAL IN SUPPORT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF J. TYLER WIESE IN SUPPORT

12/31/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF J. TYLER WIESE IN SUPPORT

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

1/3/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

1/3/2020: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020

3/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020

Answer

4/14/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/24/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

5/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

5/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/8/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/22/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

124 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Waterproofing Experts, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (DEFENDANT SOLEX CONSTRUCTION, INC. EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF; DECLARATION OF SHEILA A. BAKER) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC); Hearing on Ex Parte Ap...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Re Settlement Conference); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No. 5); Filed by Solex Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No. 4); Filed by Solex Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No.1); Filed by Solex Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Sheila Baker re Meet and Confer); Filed by Solex Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMotion in Limine (No. 2); Filed by Solex Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
162 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maryem Gharani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maryem Gharani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maryem Gharani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Maryem Gharani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maryem Gharani (Plaintiff); Amirabbas Rahim-Khoshavaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maryem Gharani (Plaintiff); Amirabbas Rahim-Khoshavaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maryem Gharani (Plaintiff); Amirabbas Rahim-Khoshavaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STERN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOLEX CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WATERPROOFING EXPERT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE is a litigant